Name in Home Country / Full Name: |
Juan Marcelo Robledo |
---|---|
Date of birth/Age: | Dec 3, 1978 (45) |
Place of Birth: | Santa Fe |
Citizenship: |
Argentina Bolivia |
Avg. term as coach: |
0.59 Years |
Coaching Licence: | UEFA Pro Licence |
Preferred formation: | 4-4-2 |
Marcelo Robledo
- Date of birth/Age: Dec 3, 1978 (45)
- Place of birth: Santa Fe
- Citizenship: Argentina
- Coaching Licence : UEFA Pro Licence
- Avg. term as coach : 0.59 Years
- Preferred formation : 4-4-2
Former player:
Last club :
Ind. Petrolero
Retired :
Jan 1, 2019
Personal Details
Stats 23/24
Competition | Matches | W | D | L | Points | PPM |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Total: | 16 | 6 | 4 | 6 | 22 | 1.38 |
División Profesional Apertura Playoff | 4 | 2 | - | 2 | 6 | 1.50 |
División Profesional Clausura | 4 | 1 | 2 | 1 | 5 | 1.25 |
División Profesional Apertura | 8 | 3 | 2 | 3 | 11 | 1.38 |
History
This is an overview of the career of a manager.
wappen | Club & role | Appointed | In charge until | Matches | PPM | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ind. Petrolero Manager | 23/24 (Oct 1, 2023) | expected - | 28 | 1.25 | ||
Libertad FC Manager | 22/23 (May 24, 2023) | 23/24 (Aug 18, 2023) | 7 | 0.71 | ||
CD Macará Manager | 22/23 (Jan 1, 2023) | 22/23 (Apr 8, 2023) | - | 0.00 | ||
Ind. Petrolero Manager | 20/21 (Oct 1, 2020) | 22/23 (Sep 1, 2022) | 63 | 1.52 | ||
Fuerza Amarilla Manager | 18/19 (Jun 9, 2019) | 18/19 (Jun 24, 2019) | - | 0.00 | ||
Ind. Petrolero Manager | 18/19 (Jan 1, 2019) | 18/19 (Jun 4, 2019) | - | 0.00 |
Transfer history as a player
This page displays all transfers for the selected player. Alongside the date of the transfer, the clubs involved and the transfer fee, it also displays the market value of the player at the time of the transfer.
Season | Date | Left | Joined | MV | Fee | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
18/19 | Jan 1, 2019 | Ind. Petrolero | Retired | - | - | |||||
18/19 | Jul 26, 2018 | Real Potosí | Ind. Petrolero | - | ? | |||||
17/18 | Jan 23, 2018 | Ciclón Tarija | Real Potosí | - | free transfer | |||||
16/17 | Jul 19, 2017 | Universitario | Ciclón Tarija | - | ? | |||||
15/16 | Jul 1, 2015 | Unknown | Universitario | - | ? | |||||
14/15 | Feb 1, 2015 | Universitario | Unknown | - | ? | |||||
13/14 | Jul 1, 2013 | Wilstermann | Universitario | - | ? | |||||
12/13 | Jul 1, 2012 | Universitario | Wilstermann | - | ? | |||||
11/12 | Jul 1, 2011 | Guabirá | Universitario | - | ? | |||||
10/11 | Jan 1, 2011 | Without Club | Guabirá | - | - | |||||
10/11 | Oct 1, 2010 | Bolívar | Without Club | - | - | |||||
09/10 | Jan 1, 2010 | Club San José | Bolívar | - | ? | |||||
09/10 | Aug 1, 2009 | Universitario | Club San José | - | ? | |||||
07/08 | Jan 1, 2008 | Wilstermann | Universitario | - | ? | |||||
05/06 | Jan 1, 2006 | The Strongest | Wilstermann | - | ? | |||||
03/04 | Jan 1, 2004 | Aurora | The Strongest | - | ? | |||||
02/03 | Jan 1, 2003 | Club San José | Aurora | - | ? | |||||
02/03 | Jul 1, 2002 | Wilstermann | Club San José | - | ? | |||||
01/02 | Jan 1, 2002 | Ind. Petrolero | Wilstermann | - | ? | |||||
Total transfer fees: | 0 |